+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-MONDAY, MAY 1,2006-7:00PM
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor