+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 16, 8:30AM, SCR2
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 9, UPON AFTERNOON RECESS SCR 1
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 108 NOES: 44
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected - AYES: 109 NOES: 041
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor