+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 2, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
- HCS Adopted
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Job Creation and Economic Development
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor