+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor