+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Vote to Reconsider - MOTION TO DO PASS AND MOTION TO ADOPT HCS
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor