+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 0
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor