+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor