+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled