+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, May 10, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 1
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Consent and House Procedure
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled