+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 26, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 000
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time