+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Senate Lounge, 8:30am
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 PRESENT: 1
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time