+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 1, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- 3/09/2004
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor