+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor