+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled