+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Stand Com on Gov. Account. & Ethics Reform
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 4, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor