+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO NOT PASS
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Education
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time