+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued
- Action Postponed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor