+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time