+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 17, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 159 NOES: 0
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 160 NOES: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 159 NOES: 0
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - ADDING AN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE CLAUSE ON THE CHILD KIDNAPPING
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - ADDING AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE LANGUAGE TO THE KIDNAPPING PROVISION IN THE BILL
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS SCOTT, BARTLE, STEELMAN, BRAY AND DAYS
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES SELF, GOODMAN, SMITH ,JOLLY AND BRINGER
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 2 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED, SA 2
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - AS AMENDED
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 1
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 2 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 159 NOES: 1
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 150 NOES: 11
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HS Adopted in House
- House Substitute Offered
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor