+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor