+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2006 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 129 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 1
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 124 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 1
On May 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
On May 11, 2006 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1-THURSDAY, APRIL 27, 2006 8:30AM
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 13, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 125 NOES: 32
- Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 1, HSA 1 FOR HA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 122 NOES: 26
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor