+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time