+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled