+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 24
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 132 NOES: 24
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - IN SECTION 137.073 AS IT RELATES TO COUNTY COLLECTORS SENDING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION TO TAXPAYERS
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - SECTION 137.073 AS IT RELATES TO COUNTY COLLECTORS SENDING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION TO TAX PAYERS
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES FRANZ, BROWN,DENISON, SKAGGS AND HUMMEL
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS GRIESHEIMER, LAGER, SCHMITT, MCKENNA AND SHOEMYER
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS#2
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - COMMITTEE VOTE RECONSIDERED-SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Returned to Committee of Origin - JOBS, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- Removed from Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 1, 2009, 12:00P.M. SENATE LOUNGE
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 3
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 18, 2008 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor