+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS HB 1613 AND HB 1445 AND HB 1454 AND HB 1462 AND HCS HB 1471 AND HB 1608 AND HB 1612 AND HB 1635 VOTED DO PASS. SEE HB 1613
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 159 NOES: 0
- HCS Adopted
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time