+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 18, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor