+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Policy
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time