+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - MOTION TO DO PASS FAILED
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 4, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 097 NOES: 054
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Urban Issues
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time