+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Public Hearing Held
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 1
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 117 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4698H02.01H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor