+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Health Insurance
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor