+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 011
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: International Trade and Job Creation
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor