+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- 2/23/2006
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor