+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 8:30AM, SCR 1
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 108 NOES: 036
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor