+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 24, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 156 NOES: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Retirement
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor