+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (62)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up - Time expired pursuant to the Constitution.
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Taken Up
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 95 NOES: 34
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 99 NOES: 32
- House Message
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Grants Conference
- Conferees Re-appointed - REPRESENTATIVES FUNDERBURK, HICKS, FRAME
- House Message
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Requests Further Conference
- Senate Message
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Refuses to Adopt
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Re-appointed - SENATORS NIEVES, MUNZLINGER, DIXON, JUSTUS, HOLSMAN
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Message
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 109 NOES: 42
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 109 NOES: 42
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - Section 571.070.1 , .
- House Message
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES FUNDERBURK, HICKS, FRAME
- House Message
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS NIEVES, MUNZLINGER, DIXON, JUSTUS, HOLSMAN
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS SCS HCS HB 1439 as amended. AYES: 113 NOES: 32
- House Message
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SS/SCS AS AMENDED PENDING
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading - SA 2 ADOPTED
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 23 NOES: 8
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 110 NOES: 41
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 110 NOES: 36
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1, ha 2, ha 3, ha 4 adopted AYES: 112 NOES: 41
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (27)
5129H15.01F
Distributed
5129H09.01F
Distributed
5129S07.01F
Distributed
Amendment 4
Distributed
5129H02.51H
Distributed
5129H02.50H
Distributed
5129H02.49H
Adopted
5129H02.42H
Adopted
5129H02.39H
Distributed
5129H02.37H
Distributed
5129H02.34H
Distributed
5129H02.33H
Distributed
5129H02.32H
Adopted
5129H02.30H
Distributed
5129H02.29H
Distributed
5129H02.28H
Distributed
5129H02.27H
Distributed
5129H02.26H
Distributed
5129H02.16H
Distributed
5129H02.15H
Distributed
5129H02.11H
Distributed
5129H02.09H
Adopted
5129H02.08H
Distributed
5129H02.05H
Distributed
5129H02.03H
Distributed
5129H02.02H
Distributed
5129H02.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor