+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 157 NOES: 2
- House Concurs - SA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 157 NOES: 1
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SA 1
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Reported Do Pass
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0
- Reported Do Pass
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
- Referred: Budget
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 ADOPTED
- HS Adopted in House
- House Substitute Offered
On April 13, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor