+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Returned to Committee of Origin
- Removed from Consent Calendar
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 3, 2006-SENATE LOUNGE-2:00PM
On March 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor