+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor