+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor