+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 12:00pm or upon morning recess whichever is later, SCR 1
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 104 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 4 NOES: 142 PRESENT: 0
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4781H02.03H
Returned
4781H01.01H
Distributed