+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Message
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SCS AS AMENDED AYES: 116 NOES: 23
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 119 NOES: 22
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 32
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 28, 2014, 8:30pm, Senate Lounge
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 7, 2014, Upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge
- Public Hearing Held
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 7
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
5326S04.01F
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor