+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 16, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 1
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor