+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled