+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SCS AYES: 140 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor