+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4268H01.09H
Distributed
4268H01.06H
Distributed