+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 2012 1:30 P.M., SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 001
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 1 AS AMENDED PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2 ADOPTED
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor