+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On March 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 19, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 2
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations
On January 10, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 8, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor