+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 21, 2016, 8:30am,SCR 2
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 147 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor