+ − Actions (25)
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - YEAS: 28 NAYS: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 3
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 149 NOES: 5
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On January 10, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
- Referred: Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 7, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor