+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: International Trade and Immigration
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 16, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor